Nguyen, Geoffrey Christopher (CPSO#: 87454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Johns Hopkins University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 437
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2819
Fax: (416) 586-5971
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Rachel Chong & Geoffrey Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Nguyen ( CPSO# 87454 )
Dr. R. Chong ( CPSO# 87099 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 437
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4975

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY CHRISTOPHER NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2008