Nguyen, Linda (CPSO#: 102210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sint Eustatius, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lower Concourse
200 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2J1
Phone: (416) 368-6787
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Nguyen ( CPSO# 102210)

Business Address:
200 Bay Street
Lower Concourse
Toronto ON  M5J 2J1
Phone Number: (416) 368-6787

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Oct 2013 to 14 Jan 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2016