Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Nguyen, Minh The (CPSO#: 61511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1919 Riverside Drive
Apartment 205
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 737-3121
Fax: (613) 737-6048
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N6N5
Canada
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.T. Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nguyen ( CPSO# 61511 )

Business Address:
205 - 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 737-3121

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 28 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 26 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MINH THE NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1990