Nguyen, Xong Thi (CPSO#: 72801)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratory Medicine
Hotel - Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411 Ext. 33145
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52436
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Xong Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Nguyen ( CPSO# 72801 )

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
1030 Ouelette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. XONG THI NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2003

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 5, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)