Nguyen-Ho, Phong (CPSO#: 70234)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
One Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: 7057435763
Fax: 7058765155
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Phong Nguyen-Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Nguyen-Ho ( CPSO# 70234 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Hospital
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-5763

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHONG NGUYEN-HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN-HO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2012