Nicolson, Robert John (CPSO#: 66406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
B8-026
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8427
Fax: (519) 685-8595
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

600 Sanatorium Rd.
London ON  N6H 3W7
Canada
Phone: (519) 858-2774 Ext. 2037
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN NICOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICOLSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2000