Nieuwstraten, Paula (CPSO#: 59917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:University of Amsterdam, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302, mailbox 6
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 585-9555
Fax: (416) 585-5815
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nieuwstraten Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Nieuwstraten ( CPSO# 59917 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 585-9555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULA NIEUWSTRATEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIEUWSTRATEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1990