Nijmeh, Paul (CPSO#: 58192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1988


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6
Phone: (416) 443-9294
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.Nijmeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2006

Dr. P. Nijmeh ( CPSO# 58192 )

Business Address:
302 - 2130 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6
Phone Number: (416) 443-9294

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 May 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. PAUL NIJMEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIJMEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1988