Nisker, William Alan (CPSO#: 51453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2951 Walker's Line
Suite 301
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 331-3101
Fax: (905) 319-2499
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Nisker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Nisker ( CPSO# 51453 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 331-3960

Business Address:
JBH
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM ALAN NISKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NISKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1983