Njoo, Howard Tjoen Hauw (CPSO#: 55768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1986


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Agency of Canada
P L 6501B
130 Colonnade Road
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: (613) 960-1940
Fax: (613) 954-8529
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

T B Clinic
Ottawa General Hospital
Module G
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8856
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa


Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. HOWARD TJOEN HAUW NJOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NJOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986