Noonan, Karen Melissa (CPSO#: 77758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
115 Downey Road
Guelph ON  N1C 1A2
Phone: (519) 827-9779
Fax: (519) 827-0162
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. M. Noonan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Noonan ( CPSO# 77758 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
115 Downey Road
Guelph ON  N1C 1A2
Phone Number: (519) 827-9779

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN MELISSA NOONAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOONAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004