Noronha, Luis Carlos Eugenio (CPSO#: 68128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
836 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6G 1M2
Phone: (416) 924-5871
Fax: (416) 924-5871
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1339 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Canada
Phone: (416) 924-5871
Fax: (416) 924-5871
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luis Noronha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Noronha ( CPSO# 68128 )

Business Address:
836 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6G 1M2
Phone Number: (416) 924-5871

Business Address:
1339 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 924-5871

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUIS CARLOS EUGENIO NORONHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORONHA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1998