Noronha, Osborne Isaac (CPSO#: 64022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2B
150 Sidney Street
Belleville ON  K8P 5E2
Phone: (613) 968-3491
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. O. Noronha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Noronha ( CPSO# 64022 )

Business Address:
Suite 2B
150 Sidney Street
Belleville ON  K8P 5E2
Phone Number: (613) 968-3491

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OSBORNE ISAAC NORONHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORONHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992