Northcott, Michael Grenville (CPSO#: 55535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: 7057282880 Ext. 46550
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Northcott and Dr. Rosemary Northcott Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Northcott ( CPSO# 55535 )
Dr. R. Northcott ( CPSO# 61119 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GRENVILLE NORTHCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORTHCOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1988