Northcott, Rosemary Diane Elizabeth (CPSO#: 61119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: Windmoller, Rosemary Diane Elizabeth (used until: 21 Jun 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 2013
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Northcott and Dr. Rosemary Northcott Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Northcott ( CPSO# 55535 )
Dr. R. Northcott ( CPSO# 61119 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSEMARY DIANE ELIZABETH NORTHCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORTHCOTT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1990