Noss, Mark Bradley (CPSO#: 65220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 341-9333
Fax: (613) 342-9009
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Bradley Noss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Noss ( CPSO# 65220 )

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 341-9333

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 17 May 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK BRADLEY NOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993