Nowicki, Iwona Maria (CPSO#: 58123)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute Mental Health
Elgin Ambulatory
294 Talbot Street Unit 1
St Thomas ON  N5P 4E3
Phone: (519) 631-0292
Fax: (519) 631-7023
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 100
231 Wharncliffe Road South
London ON  N6J 2L3
Canada
Phone: (519) 963-0620
Fax: (519) 963-0621
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I.M. Nowicki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Nowicki ( CPSO# 58123 )

Business Address:
Regional Health Care London Elgin
Unit 1
294 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 4E3
Phone Number: (519) 631-0292

Business Address:
100 - 231 Wharncliffe Road South
London ON  N6J 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 963-0620

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IWONA MARIA NOWICKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWICKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991