Nwadiaro, Nduka Francis (CPSO#: 69839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Mar 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Igbo

Education:University of Nigeria, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
130 Ouellette Place
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-9733
Fax: (519) 254-7078
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Unit 130
5 Ouellette Place
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 250-4449
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4411
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

NovaMed Diagnostics
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Novamed
2646 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 987-0611
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

CML Diagnostics
2 - 630 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4W2
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nwadiaro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nwadiaro ( CPSO# 69839 )

Business Address:
Units 3 & 5
130 Ouellette Place
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 250-4449

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
Suite 203
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 987-0611

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NDUKA FRANCIS NWADIARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWADIARO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 May 1996 to 31 May 1996
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2003