Nyhus, Nadine Janice (CPSO#: 65494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
195 Abraham St
Cambridge ON  N3H 1H4
Phone: (519) 803-8402
Fax: (519) 653-7423
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kerrys Place for Autism Services
Unit 3
25 Van Kirk Drive
Brampton ON  L7J 1A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 457-8711
Fax: (905) 457-8462
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nadine Nyhus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nyhus ( CPSO# 65494 )

Business Address:
Kerry's Place Autism Services
Unit 3
25 Van Kirk Drive
Brampton ON  L7A 1A6
Phone Number: (905) 457-8711

Business Address:
19 Willow Street
Acton ON  L7A 1Z6
Phone Number: (519) 853-9741

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Jul 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADINE JANICE NYHUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NYHUS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993