O'Brien, David Michael (CPSO#: 51578)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
216 Front Street
Belleville ON  K8N 2Z2
Phone: (613) 967-9688
Fax: (613) 967-2422
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Michael O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2012


Corporation Name: David Michael O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. O'Brien ( CPSO# 51578 )

Business Address:
216 Front Street
Belleville ON  K8N 2Z2
Phone Number: (613) 967-9688

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1985