O'Brien, Meagan Ruth (CPSO#: 83528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
South Building
Ambulatory Centre B Wing
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 633-9292
Fax: (519) 633-9413
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kraemer O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. O'Brien ( CPSO# 83528 )
Dr. G. Kraemer ( CPSO# 94973 )

Business Address:
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Business Address:
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
B Wing
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 633-9292

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEAGAN RUTH O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Jul 2005 to 24 Aug 2005
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2011