O'Brien, Sharon Rose (CPSO#: 59607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 523
1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone: (416) 439-2335
Fax: (416) 439-3078
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. O'Brien ( CPSO# 59607 )

Business Address:
Suite 523
1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 439-2335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON ROSE O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1992