O'Brien, Thomas James (CPSO#: 90847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
421 Greenbrook Drive
Suite 23B
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas J. O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. O'Brien ( CPSO# 90847 )

Business Address:
23B - 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 578-3510

Business Address:
835 King Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS JAMES O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011