O'Connor, Paul Williams (CPSO#: 31979)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 6 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2015

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 5, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. O' Connor has resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.