O'Dea, Dominic Augustine (CPSO#: 29532)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dominic O'Dea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Centenary Health Centre, Department of Psychiarty, 2867 Ellesmere Road, Scarborough, ON, M1E 4B9
Date Received: 08 Aug 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2016