O'Dea, Mary Joan (CPSO#: 50447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Names: Donaghy, Mary Joan (used until: 22 Nov 1984 )     O'Dea Donaghy, Mary Joan (used until: 21 Jun 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Galway, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A2
150 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P1
Phone: (905) 945-5424
Fax: (905) 945-4772
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S Donaghy and M O'Dea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY JOAN O'DEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'DEA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1984