O'Doherty, Brian Michael James (CPSO#: 67748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
920 1st Ave. West
Suite 400
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K5
Phone: (519) 371-5858
Fax: (519) 371-4853
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McArthur O'Doherty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. O'Doherty ( CPSO# 67748 )
Dr. A. McArthur ( CPSO# 67745 )

Business Address:
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Business Address:
Suite 400
920 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K5
Phone Number: (519) 371-5858

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN MICHAEL JAMES O'DOHERTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'DOHERTY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998