O'Donnell, Patricia Margaret Elizabeth (CPSO#: 60601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Apr 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Willow Family Physicians
325 University Avenue
Kingston ON  K7L 3R4
Phone: (613) 544-2902
Fax: (613) 544-5768
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cancer Centre South Eastern Ontario
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Donnell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. O'Donnell ( CPSO# 60601 )
Dr. D. O'Donnell ( CPSO# 60408 )

Business Address:
Richardson House
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 548-2339

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA MARGARET ELIZABETH O'DONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'DONNELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1990