O'Grady, Kevin Francis (CPSO#: 73572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 417-3544
Fax: (905) 417-6675
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. O'Grady Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. O'Grady ( CPSO# 73572 )

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
205 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 417-3544

Business Address:
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 853-2216

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN FRANCIS O'GRADY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'GRADY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004