O'Kane, Grainne Mary (CPSO#: 108292)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 24 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Power Generation Building
Suite 7W - 389
700 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone: (416) 274-6924
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Kavanagh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kavanagh ( CPSO# 107410)
Dr. G. O'Kane ( CPSO# 108292)

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3111

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Business Address:
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAINNE MARY O'KANE may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. O'KANE is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. O'KANE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. O'KANE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. O'KANE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. O'KANE ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. O'KANE ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 23 Mar 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018