O'Keefe, Debrah Lynn (CPSO#: 54375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
737 Parkdale Avenue
Suite 411/412
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16574
Fax: (613) 761-4665
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. O'Keefe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. O'Keefe ( CPSO# 54375 )

Business Address:
411 - 737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 04 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBRAH LYNN O'KEEFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'KEEFE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1987