O'Leary, James Daniel (CPSO#: 90213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2012

Expiry Date:  29 Aug 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Aug 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia
Room 2212J
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7240
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James O'Leary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. O'Leary ( CPSO# 90213 )
Dr. N. Mc Auliffe ( CPSO# 92340 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia and Pain Medicine
Room 2212J
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Aug 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2009 to 08 Apr 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. James Daniel O'Leary may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia, Division of Paediatric Anaesthesia, University of
                        Toronto, in which Dr. O'Leary holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. O'Leary  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. O'Leary's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. O'Leary's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on August 30, 2012.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on August 29, 2019.