O'Neill, James Peter (CPSO#: 55678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 511 111 Champagne Avenue Sout
Ottawa ON  K1S3L5
Phone: 6134834947
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

P O Box 8225
Station T
Ottawa ON  K1G 3H7
Canada
Phone: 877-725-9965
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Peter O'Neill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 17 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES PETER O'NEILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'NEILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1989