O'Shea, Eoghan Brendan (CPSO#: 63236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Nov 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Jan 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gaelic

Education:National University of Ireland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Health Team
Civic Campus Ottawa Hospital
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Family Medicine Centre
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2010 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:00 p.m., January 26, 2010, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Eoghan Brendan O'Shea:

                  (a)   Dr. O'Shea shall not engage or associate himself with the provision
                        of complementary medical treatment for terminal disease;
                  
                  (b)   Dr. O'Shea shall not prescribe or compound "compound products" to
                        treat terminal disease in the context of a complementary medicine
                        practice;
                  
                  (c)   Dr. O'Shea shall not knowingly or with his consent work for or
                        associate himself with the Canadian Cancer Research Group or its
                        related organizations;
                  
                  (d)   To the extent Dr. O'Shea is permitted to practice Complementary
                        Medicine, Dr. O'Shea shall adhere to the College's policy on
                        Complementary Medicine as may be amended from time to time,
                        including, but not limited to, obtaining informed consent and
                        examining patients before prescribing to them; and 
                  
                  (e)   At his own expense, Dr. O'Shea shall complete the College's Medical
                        Ethics and Informed Consent course, within one year of the date of
                        this Order.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Jan 2010
Summary:

On January 26, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Eoghan Brendan O'Shea had 
committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice 
of the profession.  Dr. O'Shea was medical director, from 2000 to 2002 and approximately 
September 2005 to June 2006, of Canadian Cancer Research Group (CCRG), a private 
complementary medicine organization whose patient population consisted of, among others, 
terminally ill cancer patients.   While employed at, affiliated with or consulting for CCRG, Dr. 
O'Shea failed to maintain the standard of practice by:   a) failing to examine the organization's 
patients or obtain informed consent before prescribing to them; b) failing to communicate with 
the organization's patients' conventional medicine physicians and/or oncologists; and c) failing to 
make reference in his charts to communications with the organization's patients' conventional 
medicine physicians and/or oncologists.   
  
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar impose immediately the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
      O'Shea's certificate of registration: 
 
      (a)   Dr. O'Shea shall not engage or associate himself with the provision of 
            complementary medical treatment for terminal disease; 
 
      (b)   Dr. O'Shea shall not prescribe or compound "compound products" to treat 
            terminal disease in the context of a complementary medicine practice; 
 
      (c)   Dr. O'Shea shall not knowingly or with his consent work for or associate himself 
            with the Canadian Cancer Research Group or its related organizations; 
 
      (d)   To the extent Dr. O'Shea is permitted to practice Complementary Medicine, Dr. 
            O'Shea shall adhere to the College's policy on Complementary Medicine as may 
            be amended from time to time, including, but not limited to, obtaining informed 
            consent and examining patients before prescribing to them; and  
 
      (e)   At his own expense, Dr. O'Shea shall complete the College's Medical Ethics and 
            Informed Consent course, within one year of the date of this Order. 
 
2.    Dr. O'Shea pay to the College costs in the amount of $3, 650.00. 
 
3.    The results of this proceeding be included in the register. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal