Obnamia, Maira Mallari (CPSO#: 96983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodbine Family Health Team
Suite 120
135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 6V1
Phone: (416) 342-5140
Fax: (416) 342-5148
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Obnamia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Obnamia ( CPSO# 96983 )

Business Address:
Suite 120
135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 6V1
Phone Number: (416) 342-5140

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAIRA MALLARI OBNAMIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBNAMIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2013