Oechslin, Erwin Notker (CPSO#: 69857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 06 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Italian

Education:University of Zurich, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Congenital Cardiac Centre
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
5N - 519 North Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 6539
Fax: (416) 340-5014
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erwin Oechslin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Oechslin ( CPSO# 69857 )

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
EN - 519
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Feb 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Feb 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERWIN NOTKER OECHSLIN may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICINE, DIVISION OF CARDIOLOGY, UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. OECHSLIN holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. OECHSLIN may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. OECHSLIN no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. OECHSLIN no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. OECHSLIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 May 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2006
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 Sep 2009