Oestreicher, James Herbert (CPSO#: 32442)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1033 Bay Street
Suite 309
Toronto ON  M5S 3A5
Phone: (416) 962-5005
Fax: (416) 962-5856
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James H. Oestreicher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oestreicher ( CPSO# 32442 )

Business Address:
309 - 1033 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5S 3A5
Phone Number: (416) 962-5005

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 12 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES HERBERT OESTREICHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OESTREICHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1981