Ogilvie, Rick Arthur (CPSO#: 50024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
323 Wilson Street East
Suite 203
Ancaster ON  L9G 4A8
Phone: (905) 304-5816
Fax: (905) 304-5818
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCMASTER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL
1200 MAIN ST WEST
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73087
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

ADVANCED PHYSIOTHERAPY AND SPORTS M
550 FENNEL AVE
Hamilton ON  L8V 4S9
Canada
Phone: (905) 574-8686
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rick Ogilvie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ogilvie ( CPSO# 50024 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
323 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 4A8
Phone Number: (905) 304-5816

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Grand Cayman

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICK ARTHUR OGILVIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGILVIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1983