Ogugua, Chukwuma Stephen (CPSO#: 102335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Nov 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Igbo

Education:University of Nigeria, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Central West Sleep Affiliates
139 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2M4
Phone: (519) 741-9498
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mednik Sleep Studies & Research
Centre Inc
Suite 290
180 King Street South
Waterloo ON  N2J 1P8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Owen Sound Sleep Lab Ltd
Suite 11
945 3rd Avenue East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 2K8
Canada
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.S. Ogugua Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ogugua ( CPSO# 102335)

Business Address:
Central West Sleep Affiliates
139 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2M4
Phone Number: (519) 442-6389

Business Address:
Owen Sound Sleep Lab Ltd
Suite 11
945 3rd Avenue East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 2K8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina
USA - South Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Nov 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jul 2016
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Chukwuma  Stephen  Ogugua  may  practise  medicine  independently in sleep
            medicine.