Oh, Clifford (CPSO#: 72581)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
Queensway Site
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: (416) 521-4082
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Oh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Oh ( CPSO# 72581 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre - Queensway Site
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4196

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLIFFORD OH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2003