Oh, Jiwon (CPSO#: 82619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Neurology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jiwon Oh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oh ( CPSO# 82619 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Neurology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JIWON OH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012