Oh, Paul In Taek (CPSO#: 59318)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Rehab - Cardiac Program
347 Rumsey Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R7
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 5267
Fax: (416) 597-7027
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Oh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Oh ( CPSO# 59318 )

Business Address:
Toronto Rehab - Cardiac Program
347 Rumsey Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R7
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Rumsey Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL IN TAEK OH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 6 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1989