Oikonomou, Anastasia (CPSO#: 76829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2013

Expiry Date:  26 Aug 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Aug 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
room AG271b
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 1491
Fax: (416) 480-5855
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862


Corporation Name: Anastasia Oikonomou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite AG271b
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Greece

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 Aug 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 09 Jul 2001 to 08 Jul 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 09 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Aug 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 May 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Anastasia Oikonomou may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging, Division of Cardiothoracic Imaging, University of Toronto,
                        in which Dr. Oikonomou holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Oikonomou  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Oikonomou's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Oikonomou's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on August 27, 2013.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on August 26, 2020.