Okafor, Innocent Chukwudumebi (CPSO#: 86363)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ibo, Yoruba

Education:University of Benin, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5085 Mayfield Road
Brampton ON  L6R 3S9
Phone: (905) 499-2857
Fax: (905) 789-7857
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Innocent Chukwudumebi Okafor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Okafor ( CPSO# 86363 )

Business Address:
5085 Mayfield Road
Brampton ON  L6R 3S9
Phone Number: (905) 499-2857

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INNOCENT CHUKWUDUMEBI OKAFOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKAFOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2008