Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Oliver, Dijana (CPSO#: 58632)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: Begovic, Dijana (used until: 17 Aug 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University of Sarajevo, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 Ontario Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2Y4
Phone: (613) 544-9121
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Oliver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Oliver ( CPSO# 58632 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Corrections Canada
443 Union Street
Kingston ON  K7L 4Y8
Phone Number: (613) 536-4527

Business Address:
130 Ontario Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2Y4
Phone Number: (613) 544-9121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIJANA OLIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991