Oliver, Gillian Denize (CPSO#: 53882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
920 King Street
Suite 7
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G4
Phone: (519) 744-0800
Fax: (519) 744-0180
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Oliver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Oliver ( CPSO# 53882 )

Business Address:
Suite 7
920 King Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G4
Phone Number: (519) 744-0800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLIAN DENIZE OLIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1988