Oliver, Sarah Jean (CPSO#: 71638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
U of Ottawa Family Health Team
University of Ottawa
100 Marie Curie Suite 300
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah J. Oliver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Oliver ( CPSO# 71638 )

Business Address:
U of Ottawa Family Health Team
300 - 100 Marie Curie
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH JEAN OLIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 15 Nov 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 1999 to 01 May 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 May 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 21 May 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 May 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2001