Oliverio, Paolo (CPSO#: 71166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2010


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
545 Niagara Street
Unit #1
Welland ON  L3C 1L7
Phone: (289) 820-5222
Fax: (289) 820-5656
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paolo Oliverio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2009

Dr. P. Oliverio ( CPSO# 71166 )

Business Address:
1 - 545 Niagara Street
Welland ON  L3C 1L7
Phone Number: (289) 820-5222


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. PAOLO OLIVERIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVERIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2010