Olivieri, Loretta Susanne (CPSO#: 84904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Health Campus
Department of Anesthesia
4448 Front Street
Calgary AB  T3M 1M4
Phone: (403) 956-3883
Fax: (403) 956-1599
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Loretta S. Olivieri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 17 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORETTA SUSANNE OLIVIERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVIERI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2007