Omidvar, Vida (CPSO#: 98770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206 - 240 Wharncliffe Rd N.
London, ON
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone: (519) 601-2221
Fax: (519) 266-9600
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omidvar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Omidvar ( CPSO# 98770 )

Business Address:
206 - 240 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone Number: (519) 601-2221

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIDA OMIDVAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMIDVAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2014